Cusimano, Steven Lawrence (CPSO#: 65127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 Parkdale Avenue South
Suite 204
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone: (905) 547-6331
Fax: (905) 547-5755
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven L. Cusimano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cusimano ( CPSO# 65127 )

Business Address:
204 - 132 Parkdale Avenue South
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone Number: (905) 547-6331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LAWRENCE CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993