Cutz, Ernest (CPSO#: 41886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5966
Fax: (416) 813-5974
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERNEST CUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994