Cvejic, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sherbourne St., Unit 606
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: 6473483886
Fax: 6473488099
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CVEJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CVEJIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2001