Cvetic, Valentina (CPSO#: 72234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yugoslav

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 621-1664
Fax: (519) 621-5908
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Cvetic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Cvetic ( CPSO# 72234 )

Business Address:
1 - 695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (905) 864-3211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALENTINA CVETIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CVETIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2003