Cwinn, Anthony Adam (CPSO#: 33527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Adam Cwinn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cwinn ( CPSO# 33527 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8136

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 296-6363

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY ADAM CWINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CWINN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989