Cybulski, Peter Andrew (CPSO#: 75803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 313
751 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone: (519) 954-2370
Fax: (519) 954-8560
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cybulski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cybulski ( CPSO# 75803 )

Business Address:
Suite 313
751 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 954-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ANDREW CYBULSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 28 Feb 2001
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002