Cybulskie, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 52882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.A. Cybulskie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cybulskie ( CPSO# 52882 )

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN CYBULSKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985