Cybulsky, Irene Joanna (CPSO#: 54036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE JOANNA CYBULSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985