Cybulsky, Myron Ivan (CPSO#: 50316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton - 11
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 581-7483
Fax: (416) 581-7484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Hohol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cybulsky ( CPSO# 50316 )
Dr. M. Hohol ( CPSO# 55864 )

Business Address:
Suite 943
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRON IVAN CYBULSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYBULSKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1990