Cyr, Jason Denis (CPSO#: 87188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital - Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JD Cyr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cyr ( CPSO# 87188 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Wilson Site
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON DENIS CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012