Cyr, Michael Mark (CPSO#: 68977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walkers Line
Suite 301
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 331-3101
Fax: (905) 319-2499
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

HSC Room 3W11
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Cyr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cyr ( CPSO# 68977 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (905) 331-3975

Business Address:
HSC Room 3W11
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARK CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999