Cyr, Pamela Valerie (CPSO#: 69002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: Kuzmich, Pamela Valerie (used until: 06 Nov 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Pathology
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Ext. 2223
Fax: (519) 740-4916
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA VALERIE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000