Cyriac, Sunu Lazar (CPSO#: 110930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Calicut University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U H N Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Rm 5 216
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNU LAZAR CYRIAC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CYRIAC is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. CYRIAC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CYRIAC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. CYRIAC shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CYRIAC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. CYRIAC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 23 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018