Cywes, Robert (CPSO#: 64254)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 12 Oct 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003