Czajka-Fedirchuk, Cynthia Pamela (CPSO#: 86459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Czajka, Cynthia Pamela (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Czajka-Fedirchuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Kenora Medical Associates, 45 Wolsley Street, Kenora, ON P9N 3W7
Date Received: 28 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016