Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Czarnowski, Zdzislaw Charles (CPSO#: 62084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  April  30,  2012,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.  Zdzislaw  Charles
            Czarnowski,  in  accordance  with  an  undertaking  and  consent  given  by Dr.
            Czarnowski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.   Zdzislaw   Charles  Czarnowski  has  voluntarily  relinquished  his
                  prescribing privileges  with  respect  to the following drugs, substances
                  and  preparations set out in the corresponding  regulations,  as  amended
                  from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and             X
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)