Czechowicz, Dominika Magdalena (CPSO#: 82766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 205
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X3
Phone: (613) 421-6111
Fax: (613) 421-9559
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominika Czechowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Czechowicz ( CPSO# 82766 )

Business Address:
117 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 205
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X3
Phone Number: (613) 421-6111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIKA MAGDALENA CZECHOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZECHOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010