Czechowski, Maciej Michal (CPSO#: 88248)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 05 May 2008 to 30 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jun 2013