Czegledi, Magdalena Susan Clara (CPSO#: 63786)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: Viner :, Magdalena Susan Clara (used until: 17 Jun 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002