Czerkawski, Barbara Anna (CPSO#: 50317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Royal Ave
Kelowna BC  V1Y 5L3
Phone: 250 712 3930

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNA CZERKAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZERKAWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992