Czikk, Marie Julianna (CPSO#: 82908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
700 University Ave
Room 3-910
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6499
Fax: (416) 586-8718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marie Czikk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Czikk ( CPSO# 82908 )

Business Address:
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 3-910
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE JULIANNA CZIKK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZIKK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012