Czolpinski, Tadeusz Ryszard (CPSO#: 58742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czolpinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Czolpinski ( CPSO# 58742 )

Business Address:
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-5406

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TADEUSZ RYSZARD CZOLPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZOLPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 02 May 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1988