Czuba, Tadeuz (CPSO#: 18656)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001