Boparai, Dennis Kiranpal S (CPSO#: 81452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (647) 895-2301
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: Dennis Boparai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (647) 895-2301

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
679 Davis Drive
Suite 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, 5
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 533-6336

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS KIRANPAL S BOPARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOPARAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2010