Dixon, David Robert (CPSO#: 65384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dixon Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. P. Fox ( CPSO# 57143 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993