Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

D'Addario, Denise Joanne (CPSO#: 59365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone: (705) 300-5790
Fax: (877) 396-7594
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.J. D'Addario Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Addario ( CPSO# 59365 )

Business Address:
36 Victoria Street West
Suite 205
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone Number: (705) 300-5790

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE JOANNE D'ADDARIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ADDARIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1989