D'Agrosa, Raffaele Michael (CPSO#: 68007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1223 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone: (416) 691-7385
Fax: (416) 691-7099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. M. D'Agrosa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Agrosa ( CPSO# 68007 )

Business Address:
301 - 1223 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6E 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 691-7385

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  July  22,  2010,  the  following  is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the certificate of registration  held  by  Dr.Raffaele  Michael
            D'Agrosa, in accordance  with  an undertaking and consent given by Dr. D'Agrosa
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Raffaele  Michael  D'Agrosa   has   voluntarily   relinquished   his
                  prescribing  privileges  with  respect to the following drugs, substances
                  and preparations set out in the  corresponding  regulations,  as  amended
                  from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished         Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)                                       X