D'Aloisio, Nicholas Dean (CPSO#: 101266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

K-W Walk In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Canada
Phone: (519) 279-4098
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Emergency Department
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Waterloo Walk In Clinic
170 University Ave W
Unit 13
Waterloo ON  N2L3E9
Canada
Phone: (519) 725-1514
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas D. D'Aloisio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. D'Aloisio ( CPSO# 101266)

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (000) 494-2120

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6004

Business Address:
Waterloo Walk-In Clinic
Suite 13
170 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E6
Phone Number: (519) 725-1514

Business Address:
K-W Walk-In Clinic
100 The Boardwalk
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B1
Phone Number: (519) 279-4098

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS DEAN D'ALOISIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ALOISIO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015