D'Alton, Joseph Gerard (CPSO#: 52907)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002