D'Amato, Charles Roland (CPSO#: 53534)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Hahnemann Medical College, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992