D'Amico, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 65071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 403
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 224-6026
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. D'Amico Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Amico ( CPSO# 65071 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 224-6026

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY D'AMICO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'AMICO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993