Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

D'Angelo, Gregory Louis (CPSO#: 50355)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014