D'Anjou, Guy (CPSO#: 21266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2008