D'Aoust-Bernard, Chantal Marguerite (CPSO#: 65647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
390 McArthur Avenue
Vanier ON  K1L 6N6
Phone: (613) 741-1134
Fax: (613) 741-4276
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. D'Aoust-Bernard Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Aoust-Bernard ( CPSO# 65647 )

Business Address:
390 McArthur Avenue
Vanier ON  K1L 6N6
Phone Number: (613) 741-1134

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL MARGUERITE D'AOUST-BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'AOUST-BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993