D'Aragon, Frederick (CPSO#: 98757)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016