D'Arsigny, Christine Linda (CPSO#: 67238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
102 Stuart Street
Richardson House
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2371
Fax: (613) 549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine D'Arsigny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Arsigny ( CPSO# 67238 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2371

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LINDA D'ARSIGNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'ARSIGNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993