D'Cunha, Nolda Meera (CPSO#: 62699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Konkani, Urdu

Education:University of Madras, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2G9
Phone: (416) 924-6116
Fax: (416) 924-6116
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nolda D'Cunha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. D'Cunha ( CPSO# 62699 )

Business Address:
430 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2G9
Phone Number: (416) 924-6116

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOLDA MEERA D'CUNHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'CUNHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1991