D'Iorio, Anne Marie Michele (CPSO#: 27589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
324 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H4
Phone: (905) 274-8914
Fax: (905) 274-1654
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Iorio-Tirovolas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tirovolas ( CPSO# 33631 )
Dr. A. D'Iorio ( CPSO# 27589 )

Business Address:
324 Lakeshore Road East
Mississauga ON  L5G 1H4
Phone Number: (905) 274-8914

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MARIE MICHELE D'IORIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'IORIO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975