D'Mello, Nisha Ann (CPSO#: 76270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CorCare
410-325 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nisha D'Mello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. D'Mello ( CPSO# 76270 )

Business Address:
CorCare
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHA ANN D'MELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'MELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2007 to 26 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2007