D'Ovidio, Frank (CPSO#: 75874)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bologna, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 25 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2004