D'Ovidio, Vincenzo (CPSO#: 18549)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Bologna, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416 398 0638 Fax: 416 398 5932 Toll Free: 1 888 563 3732
Date Received: 08 Jul 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015