D'Silva, Lorna Agnes (CPSO#: 32356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone: (905) 849-0986
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2885 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON  M8V 1J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-5100
Fax: (416) 259-6958
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorna D'Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. D'Silva ( CPSO# 32356 )

Business Address:
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone Number: (905) 845-9293

Business Address:
2885 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1J1
Phone Number: (416) 259-5100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNA AGNES D'SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SILVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1991