D'Souza, David Paul (CPSO#: 69115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Victoria Hospital LHSC
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David P. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 69115 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001