D'Souza, Sudhir Jude Anthony (CPSO#: 68256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Dec 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104B
205 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5G6
Phone: (226) 721-5437
Fax: (519) 937-1697
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudhir D' Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. D'Souza ( CPSO# 68256 )

Business Address:
205 Oxford Street East
Suite 104B
London ON  N6A 5G6
Phone Number: (226) 721-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHIR JUDE ANTHONY D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1995

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)