D'Urzo, Anthony Dominic (CPSO#: 62422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1670 Dufferin Street
Suite 107
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone: (416) 652-9336
Fax: (416) 652-0218
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.D. D'Urzo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. D'Urzo ( CPSO# 62422 )

Business Address:
107 - 1670 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M2
Phone Number: (416) 652-9336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY DOMINIC D'URZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'URZO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991