Da Costa, Laurington Ramsay (CPSO#: 24190)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015