Da Costa, Rhiannon (CPSO#: 69161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6333
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhiannon Da Costa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Da Costa ( CPSO# 69161 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHIANNON DA COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA COSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001