Da Silva, Orlando Pereira (CPSO#: 56024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hosptial, London Health
Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room D4-210
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 65925
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. P. Da Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Da Silva ( CPSO# 56024 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
D4-210
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORLANDO PEREIRA DA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SILVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991