Da Silva, Sidney Joaquim (CPSO#: 33061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: De Silva, Sidney Joaquim (used until: 22 Dec 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nairobi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WINDSOR REGIONAL HOSPITAL- MET CAMP
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52201
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Essex County Comprehensive
Pain Clinic
2525 Roseville Garden Dr.
Suite 302
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 971-0011
Fax: (519) 971-0011
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.S. Da Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Da Silva ( CPSO# 33061 )

Business Address:
Windsor Essex County Comprehensive
Pain Clinic
Suite 302
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone Number: (519) 971-0011

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDNEY JOAQUIM DA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SILVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1982