Da Silva, Vasco Ferreira (CPSO#: 53655)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Ferreira Da Silva, Vasco Argentino De Matos (used until: 18 Sep 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Lausanne, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vasco Da Silva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Dynacare 115 MidAir Court Brampton ON L6T 5M3 T: (800) 668-2714 F: (905) 790-3055
Instructions: Medical records location for encounters before 2003
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017


Address: EMR The Ottawa Hospital 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9 T: (613) 798-1741 F: (613) 761-4462
Instructions: Medical records location for encounters in 2003 and after
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017